Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon William Gabriel Bruté de Rémur

Deceased

Bishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1779Born
11 Jun 180829.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 183455.1AppointedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
28 Oct 183455.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
26 Jun 183960.2DiedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Simon William Gabriel Bruté de Rémur (VIAF: 46319727)
Bishop Simon William Gabriel Bruté de Rémur (born , died ) Bishop of Vincennes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes, France

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,834, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast