Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude André

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1743BornDelphinatu
21 Apr 180258.9SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
29 Apr 180258.9ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
9 May 180258.9Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
Dec 1804²61.5ResignedBishop of Quimper, France
25 Aug 181875.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Quimper, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude André:
Bishop Claude André (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quimper

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013