Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Caprara Montecuccoli

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1733BornBologna
22 Dec 176532.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
1 Dec 176633.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
8 Dec 176633.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
18 Dec 176633.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
6 Sep 177542.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
7 May 178551.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
18 Jun 179259.0Elevated to Cardinal
31 Jan 179359.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
21 Feb 179460.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
11 Aug 180067.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Jesi, Italy
24 May 180268.9AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Jun 181077.0DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Caprara Montecuccoli
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Caprara Montecuccoli (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Jun 1792
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 61, and Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016