Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionys von Rost

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1716³BornBreitenwang
21 Sep 174024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
16 Apr 177761.2SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
28 Jul 177761.5ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
14 Sep 177761.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
31 Oct 179377.7DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionys von Rost:
Bishop Dionys von Rost (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015