Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chur

Dioecesis Curiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vitus Huonder, Bishop
  • Marian Eleganti, O.S.B., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Amédée (Antoine-Marie) Grab, O.S.B., Bishop Emeritus
  • Peter Henrici, S.J., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Paul Vollmar, S. M., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 8 April 1847
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Switzerland
  • Square Kilometers: 12,272 (4,740 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bistum-chur.ch/
  • Mailing Address: Bischofliches Ordinariat, Hof 19, Postfach 133, CH-7002 Chur 2, Schweiz
  • Telephone: (081)258.60.00
  • Fax: 258.60.01

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chur
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Chur (erected)
2 May 1818Territory AddedDiocese of Konstanz {Constance} Diocese of Chur
Diocese of Chur-Sankt Gallen
2 July 1823Name ChangedDiocese of Chur Diocese of Chur-Sankt Gallen
Diocese of Chur
8 April 1847SplitDiocese of Chur-Sankt Gallen Diocese of Chur
Diocese of Sankt Gallen
1921Territory AddedPrefecture Apostolic of Rhétie (Rezia, Rhaetia) (suppressed) Diocese of Chur
2 December 1997Territory LostDiocese of Chur Archdiocese of Vaduz (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chur
1948980,162.0%54541596004973,160264ap1951
1970555,3601,311,93042.3%5744009745704002,565259ap1971
1980790,0001,690,00046.7%5714029738114771,935340ap1981
1990726,0001,631,00044.5%48030778792223651,883341ap1991
1999684,9301,649,00041.5%4222376591,039173051,116305ap2000
2000655,5001,582,10041.4%3932406331,035183081,942309ap2001
2001631,0201,593,55539.6%3882286161,024283341,100309ap2002
2002610,0301,530,45039.9%387278665917313751,075309ap2003
2003658,7701,706,29038.6%377296673978284051,065309ap2004
2004777,2801,642,57547.3%3853006851,13433366977309ap2005
2006686,4461,655,70841.5%3812806611,03836395965308ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014