Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter von Rascher

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549¹Born
6 Nov 158132.8AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
25 Mar 158233.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
3 Jan 160152.0DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter von Rascher (VIAF: 42656065)
Bishop Peter von Rascher (born 1549, died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Ordained BishopStadtpfarrkirche, Feldkirch

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,827
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,582, Number 5
  • d: CB, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast