Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich de Mont

Deceased

Bishop of Chur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1624BornLugnez
1649¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
23 Feb 166137.1SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
19 Dec 166137.9ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
5 May 166238.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
28 Feb 169268.1DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ulrich de Mont:
Bishop Ulrich de Mont (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013