Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominikus (Martin Karl) Willi, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1844Born
13 Nov 186521.5ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
12 May 186723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
15 Jun 189854.1SelectedBishop of Limburg, Germany
22 Jul 189854.2ConfirmedBishop of Limburg, Germany
8 Sep 189854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
5 Jan 191368.7DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dominikus (Martin Karl) Willi (VIAF: 89337566)
Bishop Dominikus (Martin Karl) Willi O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEms, Diocese of Chur-Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Limburg, Diocese of Limburg

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 343
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017