Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Damian Schmitt

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1858Born
28 Oct 188224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
29 Dec 190648.6SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
23 Feb 190748.8ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
19 Mar 190748.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
10 Apr 193980.9DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Damian Schmitt
Bishop Josef Damian Schmitt (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarbach

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018