Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Leopold Haffner

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1829Born
10 Aug 185223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
186434.9IncardinatedPriest of Mainz, Germany
10 Jun 188657.3AppointedBishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Jul 188657.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany
2 Nov 189970.7DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Leopold Haffner (VIAF: 62298523)
Bishop Paul Leopold Haffner (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorb, Diocese of Rottenburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mainz, Diocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017