Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

Archidioecesis Coleniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rainer Maria Woelki, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Manfred Melzer, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Ansgar Puff, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Dominik Schwaderlapp, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joachim Meisner, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Klaus Dick, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8th Century
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Germany
  • Square Kilometers: 6,181 (2,387 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.erzbistum-koeln.de/
  • Mailing Address: Erzbischofliches Generalvikariat, Marzellenstrasse 32, D-50668 Koln, Bundesrepublik Deutschland
  • Telephone: (0221)16.420
  • Fax: 16.42.17.00

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Köln
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Köln (erected)
344Territory LostDiocese of Köln Diocese of Tongres (Tongeren) (erected)
Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
8th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Köln Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
1 November 787Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne} Diocese of Bremen (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Diocese of Liège
Diocese of Roermond (erected)
29 November 1801Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Diocese of Liège
Diocese of Aachen (erected)
16 August 1821Territory AddedDiocese of Aachen (suppressed) Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
13 August 1930Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne} Diocese of Aachen (erected)
23 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Diocese of Münster
Archdiocese of Paderborn
Diocese of Essen (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
19502,973,0124,797,23162.0%1,9295132,4421,2176809,012707ap1951
19692,712,0005,075,00053.4%1,6107822,3921,13351,3226,880801ap1971
19802,531,8455,050,60150.1%1,3976982,0951,2081069794,643796ap1981
19902,465,0005,000,00049.3%1,1865951,7811,3842049133,066815ap1991
19992,320,0005,300,00043.8%1,0634241,4871,5602925752,561806ap2000
20002,301,0005,325,00043.2%1,0404241,4641,5712865762,465802ap2001
20012,280,0005,300,00043.0%9923731,3651,6702905072,305797ap2002
20022,250,0005,300,00042.5%9863911,3771,6332955472,266790ap2003
20032,232,0005,320,00042.0%9773891,3661,6332895502,088780ap2004
20042,220,0005,400,00041.1%9433971,3401,6562895612,046767ap2005
20062,191,9055,360,00040.9%9063821,2881,7012955251,931743ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014