Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Pedro Wirz Kraemer

Bishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1942 BornSchwarz-Rheindorf
21 Dec 196826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
9 Nov 198543.6AppointedBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay
21 Dec 198543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay
1 Jul 200967.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minas, Uruguay
16 Oct 201068.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Pedro Wirz Kraemer:
Bishop Rodolfo Pedro Wirz Kraemer (born ) Bishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013