Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin-Joseph Antoine Sépinski, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Uruguay

Titular Archbishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1900Born
20 Dec 192424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
195251.4AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
2 Oct 196565.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Assuras
2 Oct 196565.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
21 Nov 196565.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Assuras
5 May 196968.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
29 Jul 197575.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
31 Dec 197878.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Joseph Antoine Sépinski
Archbishop Augustin-Joseph Antoine Sépinski O.F.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Uruguay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Julien-lès-Metz, France

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast