Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Delegation to Jerusalem and Palestine



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuseppe Lazzarotto, Apostolic Delegate

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Delegation
  • Erected: 11 February 1948
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Palestinian Territory, Occupied
  • Mailing Address: 91191 Jerusalem, Apostolic Delegation, P.O.B. 19-199
  • Telephone: (972-2)628.22.98; 628.86.30
  • Fax: 628.18.80

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 February 1948ErectedDelegation to Jerusalem and Palestine (erected)
28 May 1973Territory LostDelegation to Jerusalem and Palestine Nunciature to Cyprus (erected)
6 April 1994Territory LostDelegation to Jerusalem and Palestine Nunciature to Jordan (erected)
14 June 1994Territory LostDelegation to Jerusalem and Palestine Nunciature to Israel (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 15 Sep 2012