Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Sambi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to United States of America

Titular Archbishop of Bellicastrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1938BornSogliano al Rubicone, Italy
14 Mar 196425.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 198547.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
10 Oct 198547.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burundi
9 Nov 198547.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
28 Nov 199153.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Indonesia
6 Jun 199859.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus
6 Jun 199859.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Israel
6 Jun 199859.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
17 Dec 200567.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to United States of America
27 Jul 201173.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to United States of America

MicroData Summary for Pietro Sambi:
Archbishop Pietro Sambi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of United States of America

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2005
  • d: CB, 28 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015