Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Locatelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1924BornRota d'Imagna
22 May 194823.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 197752.4AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
22 Feb 197752.4AppointedBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
20 Mar 197752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
12 Nov 198864.2AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
18 Mar 200075.5RetiredBishop of Vigevano, Italy
20 Feb 200479.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Locatelli:
Bishop Giovanni Locatelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vigevano

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013