Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Borgiasz Mackiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1765³BornLubartów, Poland
21 Dec 178823.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jan 178923.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 181549.4AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
8 Apr 181751.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
13 Jan 184276.2DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Borgiasz Mackiewicz:
Bishop Franciszek Borgiasz Mackiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013