Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felicjan Konstanty Szaniawski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1668³Born
1 Nov 169425.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Nov 169425.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 170536.9SelectedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Jun 170637.5ConfirmedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
20 Feb 170738.2Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
3 Jul 172051.6AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
2 Jul 173263.6DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felicjan Konstanty Szaniawski
Bishop Felicjan Konstanty Szaniawski (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlacePosteniecz

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175, and Page 418
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,591
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,707, Number 5
  • unk: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 331, Page Not Available

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast