Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Deodat Nersesowicz

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹Born
1670¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
18 Jan 168440.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
1692²48.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
1696²52.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
Dec 1699³55.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
24 Apr 170157.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
18 Jul 170157.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
8 May 170965.3DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Deodat Nersesowicz (VIAF: 22495082)
Archbishop Deodat Nersesowicz (born 1644, died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYazlivets
Death PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)

  • a priest for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243, and Page 384
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 41
  • b/op/ob/c2: CB, 20 Dec 2017
  • ~c2: CB, 21 Dec 2017
  • c2: CB, 22 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018