Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Opizio Cardinal Pallavicini

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1632BornGenoa
27 Feb 166835.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
26 May 166835.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
30 Nov 167240.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
27 Dec 167240.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
12 Oct 168047.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
20 Nov 168048.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
2 Sep 168653.8Elevated to Cardinal
Oct 1688³55.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
14 Nov 168957.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
28 Nov 168957.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Spoleto, Italy
8 Aug 169158.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo, Italy
11 Feb 170067.3DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Opizio Pallavicini (VIAF: 44018886)
Opizio Cardinal Pallavicini (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo

  • a cardinal for 13.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 35
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016