Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Masdoni

Deceased

Bishop of Modena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1635³BornFinale
28 Apr 165822.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 169156.4AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
18 Nov 169156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
Jun 1716³81.0DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Masdoni:
Bishop Ludovico Masdoni (born , died Jun 1716) Bishop of Modena

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015