Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco de’ Marini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Molfetta

Titular Archbishop of Teodosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornGenova
2 Aug 165525.5AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
8 Aug 165525.6Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
29 Mar 166636.2AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
6 Oct 167040.7ResignedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
19 Jan 167141.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
27 Apr 1686¹56.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
170070.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Molfetta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco de’ Marini:
Archbishop Francesco de’ Marini , Bishop Emeritus of Molfetta

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 720
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 80, and Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015