Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Orsaja, O.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Feb 1676AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
1 Mar 1676Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
13 Jun 1683DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Orsaja
Archbishop Girolamo Orsaja O.M. (died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Jean de Policastro

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,676, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast