Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal Rocci

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1627BornRoma
16 Jun 166537.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Mar 1668³40.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
9 Apr 166840.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
22 Apr 166840.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
27 May 167547.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 167547.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
24 Feb 167648.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
2 Nov 168053.1DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Rocci (VIAF: 89110001)
Bernardino Cardinal Rocci (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 May 1675
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 10
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016