Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo de’ Vecchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiusi

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornSiena
Dec 1647³36.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 164837.1AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
15 Mar 164837.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
12 Mar 165746.1ResignedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
27 Apr 166756.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
13 Mar 167362.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiusi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo de’ Vecchi:
Archbishop Carlo de’ Vecchi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiusi

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155, and Page 99
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 111, Number 678
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015