Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Celio Cardinal Piccolomini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609²BornSiena
165647.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 165647.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
29 Oct 165647.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
15 Nov 165647.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
30 Aug 166354.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Jan 166455.0Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 166455.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
18 Mar 167162.2AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
24 May 168172.3DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Celio Piccolomini (VIAF: 272928183)
Celio Cardinal Piccolomini (born 1609, died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
  • a cardinal for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 119, Number 726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 20
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016