Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tolomeo Cardinal Gallio

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1527BornCernobbio
13 Sep 156033.0AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
6 Jul 156234.8AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
12 Mar 156537.5Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156537.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Teodoro
7 Sep 156538.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
14 May 156840.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
1573²45.3ResignedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
20 Apr 158759.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
2 Dec 158760.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Mar 158961.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
20 Mar 159163.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Feb 160072.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
19 Feb 160375.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
3 Feb 160779.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tolomeo Gallio:
Cardinal Tolomeo Gallio (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 41.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 301, and Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013