Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulvio Passerini

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1591AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
21 Jul 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
19 Apr 1599AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
11 Dec 1599DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fulvio Passerini
Bishop Fulvio Passerini (died ) Bishop of Pistoia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Agathe, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 126
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 30, Number 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018