Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cesare Cardinal Sacchetti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1587BornRoma
18 Nov 162335.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 162335.9AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
10 Dec 162335.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
27 Jan 162436.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
19 Jan 162638.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 162638.2AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
30 May 162638.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
2 Dec 162638.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
12 Mar 162739.2InstalledBishop of Fano, Italy
16 Sep 163547.7ResignedBishop of Fano, Italy
22 Jun 164052.5AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
29 Apr 165264.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
23 Sep 165264.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
11 Oct 165567.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
28 Jul 166173.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
28 Jun 166375.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Sacchetti (VIAF: 155498)
Giulio Cesare Cardinal Sacchetti (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
  • a cardinal for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 20, and Page 197
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 82, Number 484
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 40
  • op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 283
  • bd: AT, 4 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016