Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedicto Sánchez de Herrera

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598BornNavas de Jorquera
17 Oct 165355.8SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
12 Jan 165456.0ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
18 Jan 165456.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
11 Dec 166365.9SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
24 Mar 166466.2ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
14 Jun 167476.5DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedicto Sánchez de Herrera:
Bishop Benedicto Sánchez de Herrera (died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 183, Number 1,142
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 246, and Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013