Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Pacheco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Spain

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1550Born
2 Dec 158737.6AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
1588²37.7Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
13 Aug 160151.3AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
1622¹71.7ResignedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
6 Oct 162575.5AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
7 Apr 162676.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Pacheco
Bishop Andrés Pacheco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla de Montalbán, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSanta Maria de los Angeles, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ab/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,369
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159, and Page 209
  • obp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 101, Number 634
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast