Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Molina Alvarez

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornGranada
20 Mar 162361.2AppointedBishop of León, Spain
18 Jun 162361.5Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
Nov 162361.8DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Molina Alvarez:
Bishop Juan Molina Alvarez , Bishop of León

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 15 Dec 2013