Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal de Lobera y Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1615AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
13 Mar 1616Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
9 Jul 1618AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
6 Mar 1623AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
19 Feb 1625AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
2 Dec 1630AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
21 Oct 1632DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal de Lobera y Torres
Bishop Cristóbal de Lobera y Torres (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlasencia

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269, and Page 164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 132, Number 846
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,616, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast