Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela

Archidioecesis Pampilonensis et Tudelensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 11 August 1984
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 10,421 (4,025 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesianavarra.org/
  • Mailing Address: Plaza de Santa Maria la Real 1, 31001 Pamplona, Navarra, Espana
  • Telephone: 948.22.74.00
  • Fax: 948.22.04.40

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Pamplona
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Pamplona (erected)
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
5 September 1851UnitedDiocese of Pamplona
Diocese of Tudela
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
8 September 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Burgos
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Santander
Diocese of Vitoria (erected)
Diocese of Pamplona
17 July 1889SplitDiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Tarazona
Diocese of Pamplona
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
2 September 1955SplitDiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Tarazona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Tarazona
2 September 1955UnitedDiocese of Pamplona Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
11 August 1956ElevatedDiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela) Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela
11 August 1984Name ChangedArchdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela) Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pamplona
1950297,797297,797100.0%8922621,1542589682,079563ap1951
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
1970410,000410,52899.9%8984641,3623011,0272,805628ap1971
1980489,000510,05095.9%7824261,2084044743,010635ap1981
Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela
1990512,972523,97797.9%6283911,0195036682,264686ap1991
1999529,006530,81999.7%5424359775416732,542731ap2000
2000529,786530,81999.8%5364139495585712,351738ap2001
2001536,983538,00999.8%5413869275795682,241738ap2002
2002538,711543,75799.1%5114629735536682,268738ap2003
2003563,932569,62899.0%4964129086215362,128738ap2004
2004573,386578,21099.2%5022777797364542,053739ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 4 Mar 2014