Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Santander

Dioecesis Santanderiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 12 December 1754
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Oviedo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 5,527 (2,134 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdesantander.com/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Plaza Obispo Jose Eguino Trecu 1, 39002 Santander, Espana
  • Telephone: 942.36.56.57
  • Fax: 942.36.74.00

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
12 December 1754ErectedArchdiocese of Burgos Diocese of Santander (erected)
8 September 1861Territory LostArchdiocese of Burgos
Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)
Diocese of Santander
Diocese of Vitoria (erected)
2 November 1949Territory LostDiocese of Santander (Villaverde de Trucios)
Diocese of Vitoria (Vizcaya)
Diocese of Bilbao (erected)
17 October 1954Territory AddedDiocese of Oviedo (Tresviso with 2 parishes (in Santander)) Diocese of Santander
27 October 1954Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Santander (from Burgos)
22 November 1955Territory AddedArchdiocese of Burgos (Reinosa, Santa Cruz, Valdeprado, and La Rasa (in Santander)) Diocese of Santander
22 November 1955Territory AddedDiocese of León (parts of Santander) Diocese of Santander
22 November 1955Territory AddedDiocese of Palencia (6 parishes in Santander) Diocese of Santander

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950350,000350,000100.0%384250634552323685383ap1951
1970436,000436,41799.9%4891876766444141,558607ap1971
1980515,900518,87199.4%4132336467983761,265617ap1981
1990533,885536,18699.6%34021455496313461,170619ap1991
1999526,585530,51099.3%3002035031,0461302958617ap2000
2000526,127530,21799.2%2942024961,0601300949617ap2001
2001526,949531,55999.1%2911954861,0841285929617ap2002
2002535,458540,66399.0%2881914791,1171282905617ap2003
2003539,410545,31798.9%2901944841,1141274881617ap2004
2004545,937552,72798.8%2871874741,1511253866617ap2005
2010557,409592,87694.0%2661864521,2335245767615ap2011
2014559,000595,44993.9%2441674111,3605215710614ap2015
2017556,404585,68595.0%2201563761,4796204632617ap2018
2020553,413584,73794.6%2011333341,6566175551615ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 68
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 131, to Page 133
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 456, to Page 460
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 146, to Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 3 Jan 2024