Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Felipe Ortiz y Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1835BornCastillo de Sietevillas, Spain
17 Dec 185924.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 188650.6AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
3 Oct 188650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
19 Jan 189357.2AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
9 Feb 191478.2DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Felipe Ortiz y Gutiérrez:
Bishop Luis Felipe Ortiz y Gutiérrez (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 194, and Page 601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013