Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Santiago Sánchez de Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1841Born
10 Jun 186523.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 188442.6SelectedBishop of Santander, Spain
27 Mar 188442.6ConfirmedBishop of Santander, Spain
1 Jun 188442.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
19 Sep 192079.1DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Santiago Sánchez de Castro (VIAF: 205469430)
Bishop Vicente Santiago Sánchez de Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeromingo, Diocese of Plasencia
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 500
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,969
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017