Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santos Zárate y Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1830Born
1855¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 188756.3AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
6 Nov 188757.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
7 Aug 190675.7DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santos Zárate y Martínez
Bishop Santos Zárate y Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca Montes de Oca, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santander, Diocese of Santander

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018