Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Coria-Cáceres

Dioecesis Cauriensis-Castrorum Caeciliorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jesús Pulido Arriero, H.S.O.D., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 April 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mérida-Badajoz
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 10,052 (3,882 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesiscoriacaceres.es/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Plaza de Santa Maria 1, 10003 Caceres, Espana
  • Telephone: 927.24.52.50
  • Fax: 927.21.40.24

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Coria
1142ErectedDiocese of Coria (erected)
Diocese of Coria-Cáceres
9 April 1957Name ChangedDiocese of Coria Diocese of Coria-Cáceres
30 April 1958Territory AddedDiocese of Badajoz (Montânchez in Cáceres) Diocese of Coria-Cáceres
30 April 1958Territory LostDiocese of Coria-Cáceres (San Vicente de Alcántara and Puebla de Obando in Badajoz) Diocese of Badajoz
12 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Ávila (Guijo de Avila, Cespedosa, Bercimulle, Gallegos del Solmirón, Armenteros, Rágama, Oantaracillo, Bóveda del Bio Almar, Mancera de Abajo, Salmoral, Iñigos-Blasco, and Novaombela)
Diocese of Coria-Cáceres (Salamanca)
Diocese of Salamanca
12 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Ávila (Santibáñez de Béjar, Puente de Congosto, Navamorales, El Tejado, El Gordo, and Berrocalejo)
Diocese of Coria-Cáceres (Santa María de Baños de Montemayor)
Diocese of Plasencia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Coria
1950260,825260,825100.0%156131691,54322286131ap1951
Diocese of Coria-Cáceres
1970260,770260,770100.0%194262201,18534398150ap1971
1980245,202245,202100.0%166231891,29727362151ap1981
1990236,000237,00099.6%160251851,27529330157ap1991
1999235,068238,67098.5%163231861,263162310157ap2000
2000241,846248,75297.2%163261891,279159301158ap2001
2001244,431250,96997.4%170161861,314153310157ap2002
2002242,962252,60696.2%164181821,334154305157ap2003
2003245,160256,20695.7%161191801,362130302157ap2004
2004252,010264,09095.4%162211831,377132307159ap2005
2006251,701263,43095.5%147231701,480134298160ap2007
2013248,097251,16098.8%151281791,386735270161ap2014
2016232,520235,95198.5%150211711,359825242161ap2017
2019228,780232,16098.5%142431851,2361056222161ap2020
2021208,300217,26595.9%136221581,318835214160ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Coria
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 178
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 123
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142, and Page 143
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151, and Page 152
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 157
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 29, to Page 31
  • Diocese of Coria-Cáceres
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 821, and Page 822
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 50, Page 707, to Page 709
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 38, to Page 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 1 May 2023