Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Carvajal Girón de Loaysa

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1603AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
21 Mar 1604Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
8 Sep 1621DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Carvajal Girón de Loaysa:
Bishop Pedro Carvajal Girón de Loaysa (died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,496
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 119, Number 758
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015