Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rodrigo Cardinal de Castro Osorio (de Lemos)

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1523Born
1559²35.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Spain
30 Aug 157451.4AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
7 Nov 157451.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
13 Jun 157855.2AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
20 Oct 158158.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
15 Feb 158258.9InstalledArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
12 Dec 158360.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 158562.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
20 Sep 160077.5DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Castro Osorio (de Lemos) (VIAF: 70261443)
Rodrigo Cardinal de Castro Osorio (de Lemos) (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Ordained BishopSan Jerónimo, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Buried Place (Original)Nuestra Señra de la Antigua chapel, Cathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria de la Antigua, Monforte de Lemos

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,821
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 85, Number 519
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018