Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspar Cardinal de Quiroga y Vela

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1512Born
17 Dec 157159.9AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
15 Apr 157260.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
6 Sep 157765.6AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
15 Dec 157866.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 157866.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
12 Nov 159482.8DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar de Quiroga y Vela (VIAF: 87615252)
Gaspar Cardinal de Quiroga y Vela (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrigal de las Altas Torres, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopSanta María de las Cuevas, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)S. Agustín, Church, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Current)Augustinian Nuns, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
  • a cardinal for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1578
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,480
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 82, Number 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Nov 2017