Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Pérez Rubert

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534²Born
20 Nov 159157.8AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 Feb 159258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
8 Nov 159763.8DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Pérez Rubert
Bishop Juan Bautista Pérez Rubert (born 1534, died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 104, Number 660
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018