Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1583AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en Espańa)
5 Apr 1591AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
1 Sep 1595DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Manrique de Lara:
Bishop Jerónimo Manrique de Lara (died ) Bishop of Ávila

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 92, and Page 154
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 95, Number 593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014