Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Valencia

Archidioecesis Valentina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Enrique Benavent Vidal, Archbishop
  • Antonio Cañizares Llovera, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Esteban Escudero Torres, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Javier Salinas Viñals, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Vicente Juan Segura, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 July 1492
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 13,091 (5,056 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://www.archivalencia.org
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, c/Palau 2, 46003 Valencia, Espana
  • Telephone: 96.382.97.00
  • Fax: 96.391.82.20

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Valencia
10 October 1238ErectedDiocese of Valencia (erected)
Archdiocese of Valencia
9 July 1492ElevatedDiocese of Valencia Archdiocese of Valencia
14 March 1954Territory AddedDiocese of Orihuela (Ayora with St. Lucia) Archdiocese of Valencia
6 June 1957Territory AddedDiocese of Cuenca (Requena-Utiel) Archdiocese of Valencia
6 June 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Valencia (Callosa de Ensarriá (except the parishes of Benisa, Jijona and Villajoyosa)) Diocese of Orihuela
6 June 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Valencia (Gatova and Villahermosa del Río) Diocese of Segorbe

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Valencia
19501,650,0001,660,00099.4%7733801,1531,4316003,925432ap1951
19701,886,742.0%1,1436831,82607044,420606ap1971
19802,165,0502,279,57195.0%1,0075181,5251,41918613,691654ap1981
19902,200,1002,315,90195.0%9186181,5361,4329423,608659ap1991
19992,294,0002,415,00095.0%8107061,5161,5139283,530651ap2000
20002,369,4222,383,91299.4%7997061,5051,5749283,530651ap2001
20012,387,0882,401,93899.4%8017551,5561,5349003,515651ap2002
20022,298,4152,419,38595.0%7907791,5691,4648904,025651ap2003
20032,294,3072,499,35791.8%7867701,5561,4748754,025652ap2004
20042,484,0372,562,33396.9%7887501,5381,6158503,800652ap2005
20103,030,0003,213,00094.3%7617601,5211,992108703,810650ap2011
20143,041,0003,225,00094.3%7318101,5411,973169653,820647ap2015
20172,636,4002,792,87294.4%7456001,3451,960166893,753646ap2018
20202,657,7402,815,43094.4%8373501,1872,239345152,550649ap2021
20222,689,0002,848,56094.4%7932791,0722,508334291,820638ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Valencia
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 512
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 261
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 87, to Page 89
  • Archdiocese of Valencia
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 402
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 430
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 387
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 503, and Page 504
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 864, and Page 865

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 11 Jun 2024