Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferrer de Pallarés o de San Martín

Deceased

Bishop of Valencia


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jul 1240AppointedBishop of Valencia, Spain
12 Oct 1240³Ordained BishopBishop of Valencia, Spain
30 Apr 1243DiedBishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferrer de Pallarés o de San Martín:
Bishop Ferrer de Pallarés o de San Martín (died ) Bishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 512
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 295, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Feb 2014