Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jaime Cardinal Serra i Cau

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1428¹Born
11 Apr 149264.2AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
28 Sep 150072.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150072.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
3 Sep 150173.6AppointedAdministrator of Linköping, Sweden
28 Jun 150274.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
29 Nov 150375.9AppointedAdministrator of Potenza, Italy
7 Aug 150678.5ResignedAdministrator of Potenza, Italy
5 Sep 150678.6AppointedAdministrator of Elne, France
9 Dec 151082.9ResignedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
20 Jan 151183.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
28 Jul 151284.5AppointedAdministrator of Burgos, Spain
19 Mar 151385.2ResignedAdministrator of Elne, France
6 Apr 151385.2ResignedAdministrator of Linköping, Sweden
5 Jul 151486.5AppointedAdministrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
25 May 151587.3ResignedAdministrator of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Jul 1516³88.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
15 Mar 151789.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Serra i Cau
Jaime Cardinal Serra i Cau (born 1428, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Diocese of Valencia, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Giacomo degli Spagnoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 16.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 142, and Page 279
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 115
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 92, and Page 178
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1492, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2019

Quantcast