Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Perpignan-Elne

Dioecesis Elnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Elne
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Elne (erected)
Diocese of Perpignan-Elne
1 September 1601Name ChangedDiocese of Elne Diocese of Perpignan-Elne
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Perpignan-Elne (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Diocese of Perpignan-Elne
6 October 1822ErectedDiocese of Carcassonne Diocese of Perpignan-Elne (erected)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Perpignan-Elne (from Albi)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Perpignan-Elne
1950200,000228,77687.4%1741741,14930317223ap1951
1970268,797281,97695.3%185322171,23832245252ap1971
1980263,722309,80085.1%126391651,598158250248ap1981
1990300,000353,00085.0%105381432,097754202253ap1991
1999303,300379,20080.0%93241172,5921640142252ap2000
2000302,500392,80377.0%80331132,6761750127253ap2001
2001302,500392,80377.0%79261052,8801335136253ap2002
2002302,500392,80377.0%83241072,8271233128253ap2003
2003302,500392,80377.0%90231132,6761530118253ap2004
2004308,000400,00077.0%87211082,8511527109251ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014