Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Robuster Sala

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1591AppointedBishop of Elne, France
21 Apr 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
5 May 1598AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
27 Apr 1607DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Robuster Sala
Bishop Francisco Robuster Sala (died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReus, Archdiocese of Tarragona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Death PlaceVic, Diocese of Vic

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,842
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 192
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 103, Number 651
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018