Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofre Reart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹Born
5 Nov 157724.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 159946.0AppointedBishop of Elne, France
30 May 159946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
3 Mar 160855.1AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
19 Dec 161158.9AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
17 Feb 162168.1ResignedBishop of Gerona, Spain
13 Oct 162269.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onofre Reart (VIAF: 304456501)
Bishop Onofre Reart (born 1553, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerpiñán
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Death PlacePerpiñán, Diocese of Perpignan-Elne, France

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181, and Page 194
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,845
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 112, Number 713
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018